THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 23:31:58 PM
Korman, Irvine Allen
CPSO#:
15314
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
19 Oct 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1955
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 1960 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 1955 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 19 Oct 1990 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Jul 1990
Summary:
In July 1990, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Korman guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he made a misrepresentation respecting a remedy, treatment or device, contrary to s. 27(24); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32). The Committee also found the Doctor incompetent, as defined in s. 60(4) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he demonstrated in his professional care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue practice. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Korman's licence to practice be revoked.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 04 Jun 1990
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Aug 1988
Summary:
In August 1988, Dr. Korman pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Korman guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Korman be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of sixty days. The Committee further ruled that Dr. Korman's licence be suspended for an additional twelve months, but that this period of suspension would itself be suspended if the Doctor agreed to complete the McMaster Physician Review Program with special attention to the areas of immunology, allergy and nutrition, and any remedial programs which might be recommended under the Physician Enhancement Program, and if Dr. Korman agreed to an investigation of the kind provided for under s. 64 of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, within one year of completion of the McMaster programs. The investigation was to be conducted by investigators appointed by the Registrar into the areas of Dr. Korman's practice in immunology, allergy and nutrition, who would report their findings to the Executive Committee.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 08 Aug 1988