THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 1:57:28 AM
Fink, Napoleon Richard Telesphore
CPSO#:
14747
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jun 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1953
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1954 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 1988 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1988 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 1999 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Oct 1986
Summary:
In October 1986, Dr. Fink pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Fink guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Fink's licence be suspended for a period of six months, but that the final three months of this suspension would themselves be suspended, provided that the Doctor submitted to an investigation of his practice under s. 64 of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, on a date to be fixed by the Registrar. The Committee further ruled that a condition be imposed on Dr. Fink's licence, restricting him from prescribing narcotic drugs for as long as he practised medicine.
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1987-11-23
Hearing Date(s): 15 Oct 1986