THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:55:50 AM
Godfrey, Charles Morris
CPSO#:
14392
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Aug 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Aug 1953
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
24-Jul-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: University of Toronto, 1953
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Charles Godfrey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 24 2020
Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record should contact the clinic where they saw Dr. Godfrey.
Date Received: 31 Aug 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:28 Nov 1958 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 1953 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2020 |