THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 6:18:34 AM
Bain, Stanley Theodore
CPSO#:
14237
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1953
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1970 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1953 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1994 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Nov 1992
Summary:
In November 1992, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bain guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he contravened while engaged in the practice of medicine a federal, provincial or municipal law, regulation or rule or by-law of a hospital designed to protect the public health, contrary to s. 27(20); and in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21). Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Bain be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of two months. The Committee further ruled, however, that this suspension would itself be suspended provided that Dr. Bain undertook and completed a course in bio-ethics, to the satisfaction of the Executive Committee, within four months of this Order becoming final. This course of study was to be under the direction of an expert in bio-medical ethics, who was to be acceptable to the Registrar.
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 08 Oct 1992