THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:58:09 AM
Whiteman, Gabriel
CPSO#:
13699
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Jul 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1947
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Dec 1952 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:01 Dec 1952 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1951 to 30 Jun 1952
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 1952 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Oct 1960 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Oct 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Aug 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Jun 2000 |