THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 8:01:43 AM
Abbott, Michael Meyer
CPSO#:
13514
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
21 Sep 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Aug 1951
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
21-Sep-2019
Former Name:
Abbott, Meyer (used until: 27 Mar 2006 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1951
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to the following address:
270 Sheppard Avenue West
Willowdale, ON
M2N 1N3
Date Received: 07 Jul 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:24 Nov 1958 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1951 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 21 Sep 2019 |