THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:23:16 PM
Charendoff, Morris David
CPSO#:
12493
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
19 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jul 1950
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian, Yiddish
Education: University of Toronto, 1947
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 1953 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 1947 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1948 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1950 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Sep 2013 |