THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 11:21:00 AM
Messer, Vernon Robert
CPSO#:
12478
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Sep 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1947
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 1947 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 01 Apr 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1993 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Nov 1991
Summary:
In November 1991, Dr. Messer pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(26) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he made improper use of the authority to prescribe, sell or dispense a drug, including falsifying a record in respect of a prescription or the sale of a drug. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. Messer guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Messer be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. The Committee also ruled that Dr. Messer's licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months, but that the final two months of this suspension would themselves be suspended if the Doctor completed courses of instruction, satisfactory to the Registrar, in the proper maintenance of medical records, and the appropriate prescription of drugs to suspected drug abusers.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 20 Nov 1991
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Feb 1991
Summary:
In February 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Messer guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Messer be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. The Committee further ruled that Dr. Messer be required to attend the McMaster Physician Review and Evaluation Program within three months of this Order becoming final, and that should the Doctor fail to achieve a category 3 or better, his licence to practice would be suspended until such a standing was achieved.
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1993-01-22
Hearing Date(s): 19 Feb 1991