THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:49:55 PM
Datta, Vikas
CPSO#:
113763
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
21 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Temple University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
True North Imaging
Suite 206
7330 Yonge St.
Thornhill ON L4J 7Y7
Phone: (905) 889-5926
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:21 Aug 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Aug 2017 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 20 Feb 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Dec 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Dec 2018 |
|
Active |