THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:46:54 PM
McCormick, Thomas Jared
CPSO#:
110229
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Nov 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2016
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Lindsay McCormick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 25 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Sep 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Sep 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Oct 2021
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Feb 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 May 2022 |