THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:05:11 PM
Scott, George Ducolon
CPSO#:
10972
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
08 Aug 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
28-Mar-2005
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1939
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 1940 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Sep 1994 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 08 Aug 1995 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Aug 1995
Summary:
On August 8, 1995, Dr. Scott pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 1 of the Medical Amendment Act, 1962-63, in that he had been guilty of misconduct in a professional respect or of conduct unbecoming a medical practitioner, or of incompetence. Dr. Scott also pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 34(3)(c) of the Medical Act, 1970, as amended, in that he had been guilty of misconduct in a professional respect or of conduct unbecoming a medical practitioner, or of incompetence. The Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Scott(s plea of guilty to these allegations, and found him guilty of professional misconduct. Other allegations were adjourned sine die. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Scott's name be erased forthwith from the Medical Register of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 08, 1995