THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 6:28:12 AM
Bacher, Corey Adam
CPSO#:
106716
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Dec 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3030 Lawrence Ave E
Toronto ON M1P 2T7
Phone: 416-289-0185
Fax: 416-289-0187
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:09 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. COREY ADAM BACHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACHER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2020 |