THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 8:06:46 AM
Gow, Rachel Sara
CPSO#:
106469
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kyle Dorosh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2022 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RACHEL SARA GOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOW is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 06 May 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 07 May 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2020 to 29 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 30 Jun 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2021 to 29 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jun 2022 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2022 |