THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 12:16:51 PM
Heller, Adrian Mitchell
CPSO#:
105223
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Emergency Dept
4001 Leslie St
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6165
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital |
Southampton |
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation |
Haliburton |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:03 Nov 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADRIAN MITCHELL HELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HELLER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 Aug 2015
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jan 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2018 |