THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 10:47:53 AM
Sidiropoulos, Konstantinos
CPSO#:
100853
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical Sch, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: November 2, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On November 17, 2021, Quinte Health Care notified the College, pursuant to section 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and section 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, that Dr. Sidiropoulos’ hospital privileges were suspended effective November 2, 2021 for failure to comply with hospital policy. On September 28, 2022, Quinte Health Care notified the College, pursuant to section 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and section 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code (Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act), that Dr. Sidiropoulos’ hospital privileges at Quinte Health Care were revoked effective September 27, 2022.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KONSTANTINOS SIDIROPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDIROPOULOS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
AVP - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |