THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 9:53:10 AM
Reaume, Samantha Christine
CPSO#:
100671
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Apr 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Apr 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
80 Maria St
Tavistock ON N0B2R0
Phone: 519-655-2322
Fax: 519-655-3073
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Apr 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA CHRISTINE REAUME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REAUME is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Sep 2014 to 31 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 08 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Apr 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 2017 |