THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:54:16 AM
Dorosh, Kyle Alexander
CPSO#:
100441
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Feb 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room 260
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46368
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kyle Dorosh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KYLE ALEXANDER DOROSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOROSH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Feb 2016 |